CA SB1113 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 354, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 5845 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to mental health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental health in the workplace: voluntary standards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-21 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1113 Monning et al. Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-20 - Assembly - SB 1113 Monning Senate Third Reading By CARRILLO (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1113 Monning (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-11 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 354, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-11 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-28SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2018-08-21SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5548.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-21SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6403.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-13AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-13AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2018-07-05AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-07-05AssemblyFrom consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon.
2018-06-28AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 27).
2018-06-13AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-03AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-04-26AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-04-26SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4834.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-04-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-23SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4769.) (April 23).
2018-04-18SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2018-04-09SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-05SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4556.) (April 4).
2018-03-13SenateSet for hearing April 4.
2018-02-22SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-02-14SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
2018-02-13SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code5845Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback