CA SB1110 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-08-15 - August 15 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-08-15 - August 15 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 10609.24 and 10609.26 of, and to add Sections 10609.23 and 10609.29 to, the Water Code, relating to water.
Title
Water reports: urban retail water suppliers: informational order: conservation order.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1110 Ashby (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1110 Ashby (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-15 | Assembly | August 15 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2024-08-07 | Assembly | August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2024-06-26 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2024-06-18 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4020.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-13 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 3728.) (April 23). |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 10609.23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 10609.24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 10609.26 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Water Code | 10609.29 | New Code | See Bill Text |