CA SB1110 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 605, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 605, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 399.33 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to energy.
Title
Energy: California Renewables Portfolio Standard Program: local publicly owned electric utilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-28 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1110 Bradford Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Assembly - SB 1110 Bradford Senate Third Reading By DAHLE (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1110 Bradford (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Assembly - SB 1110 Bradford Senate Third Reading By DAHLE (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1110 Bradford (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-20 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 605, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-20 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-05 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2018-08-28 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5862.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-28 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6586.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | From consent calendar. |
2018-08-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8). |
2018-08-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-27 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on U. & E. and NAT. RES. |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4336.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-22 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Set for hearing May 22. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | May 14 hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 14. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4514.) (April 3). |
2018-03-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 399.30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 399.33 | New Code | See Bill Text |