CA SB111 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-28 - Referral to Com. on JUD. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 22454, 22454.5, and 25257 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schoolbuses: stop requirements.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-28SenateReferral to Com. on JUD. rescinded because of the limitations placed on committee hearings due to ongoing health and safety risks of the COVID-19 virus.
2021-01-28SenateReferred to Coms. on TRANS, ED., and JUD.
2021-01-11SenateRead first time.
2021-01-08SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 7.
2021-01-07SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Vehicle Code22454Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code22454.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Vehicle Code25257Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback