CA SB1108 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-26 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-26 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 368.6 of, and to add Sections 368.61, 368.9, 368.10, and 13515.4 to, the Penal Code, relating to senior and disability victimization.
Title
Senior and disability victimization.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-03-18 | Senate | March 31 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Set for hearing March 31. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | March 24 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Set for hearing March 24. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 13515.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 368.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 368.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 368.61 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 368.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1108 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1108 |