CA SB1106 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Jun 27 @ 9:00 am in State Capitol, Room 4202
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 1000.7 of the Penal Code, relating to crimes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Young adults: deferred entry of judgment pilot program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1106 Hill (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-03AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-04-26AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-04-26SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 6. Page 4834.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-04-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-23SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-04-13SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2018-04-09SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-05SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 4516.) (April 3).
2018-03-19SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-03-13SenateSet for hearing April 3.
2018-02-22SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-02-14SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
2018-02-13SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code1000.7Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback