CA SB1105 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-28 - August 12 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 664.6 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to civil actions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil actions: settlement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1105 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-28AssemblyAugust 12 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2020-07-27AssemblyJuly 30 hearing postponed by committee.
2020-07-27AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2020-07-09AssemblyJuly 22 hearing postponed by committee.
2020-06-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2020-06-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2020-06-11SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3681.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2020-05-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2020-05-22SenateFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3583.) (May 22).
2020-05-13SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2020-05-12SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2020-02-27SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2020-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
2020-02-19SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Code of Civil Procedure664.6Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback