CA SB1104 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 51, 205.5, and 5813 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Property tax: senior and disabled veterans.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Stone [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-23 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From committee without further action. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | May 27 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-05-23 | Senate | May 23 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-05-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3765.) (May 4). |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Set for hearing May 4. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | April 27 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. (Corrected February 22). |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 205.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 51 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 5813 | Amended Code | Citation Text |