CA SB1102 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-14 - Placed on inactive file on request of Senator Liu.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-14 - Placed on inactive file on request of Senator Liu.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4000 of, to add Sections 4101.5, 4102.2, 4102.4, and 4102.6 to, and to repeal and add Sections 4101 and 4102 of, the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Elections: vote by mail.
Sponsors
Sen. Carol Liu [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-14 | Placed on inactive file on request of Senator Liu. | |
2010-04-27 | Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |
2010-04-26 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 3297.) | |
2010-04-08 | Set for hearing April 20. | |
2010-04-07 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A. | |
2010-02-25 | To Com. on E., R., & C.A. | |
2010-02-18 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 20. | |
2010-02-17 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |