CA SB1100 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 171, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-08-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 171, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 54957.95 to the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
Open meetings: orderly conduct.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-04 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1100 Cortese et al. Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Assembly - SB 1100 Cortese Senate Third Reading By Low (Y: 57 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1100 Cortese et al (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-01 - Assembly - SB 1100 Cortese Senate Third Reading By Low (Y: 57 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1100 Cortese et al (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 171, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-08-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-10 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2022-08-04 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 4655.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-01 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 57. Noes 18. Page 5712.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-06-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (June 21). |
2022-06-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-06-16 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-06-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | June 8 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and JUD. |
2022-05-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 3580.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 3436.) (April 19). |
2022-04-07 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | April 5 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3149.) (March 17). |
2022-03-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Set for hearing March 17. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and JUD. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 54957.95 | New Code | See Bill Text |