CA SB1100 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Referral to Coms. on EQ., and G.O. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Water Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Referral to Coms. on EQ., and G.O. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
Pending: Senate Natural Resources and Water Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 30001.5, 30501, and 71116 of, to add Section 30421 to, to add Article 8 (commencing with Section 30270) to Chapter 3 of Division 20 of, and to add Division 20.6.5 (commencing with Section 30970) to, the Public Resources Code, relating to coastal resources.
Title
Coastal resources: sea level rise.
Sponsors
Sen. Toni Atkins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referral to Coms. on EQ., and G.O. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar. |
2020-03-18 | Senate | March 24 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Set for hearing March 24. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W., EQ., and G.O. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 30001.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 30421 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 30501 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 71116 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1100 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1100 |