CA SB1100 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 894, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 27510 and 29182 of the Penal Code, relating to firearms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms: transfers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1100 Portantino et al. Concurrence (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Assembly - SB 1100 Portantino Senate Third Reading By BONTA (Y: 47 N: 30 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1100 Portantino et al (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1100 Portantino et al. Reconsider (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1100 Portantino et al (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-28 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 894, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-28 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-06SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-29SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 5958.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-28SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-28AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 47. Noes 30. Page 6721.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-23AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-23AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 16).
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-28AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-11AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-06-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-05-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 10. Page 4352.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-29SenateReconsideration granted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4352.)
2018-05-29SenateMotion to reconsider made by Senator Portantino.
2018-05-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 4350.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 4303.) (May 25).
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-04-30SenateApril 30 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-20SenateSet for hearing April 30.
2018-04-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3799.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-06SenateSet for hearing April 17.
2018-04-04SenateRe-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2018-03-19SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-03-08SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-14SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
2018-02-13SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code65New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code26835Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code27510Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code27535Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code27540Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code27590Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code29182Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback