CA SB1099 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 42451.1 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to nonvehicular air pollution.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency backup generators: critical facilities: order for abatement: stipulations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1099 Dodd et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-29 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2020-06-25AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2020-06-25SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2020-06-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-08SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2020-06-04SenateSet for hearing June 9.
2020-06-02SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-05-29SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3622.) (May 29).
2020-05-22SenateSet for hearing May 29.
2020-03-18SenateApril 1 hearing postponed by committee.
2020-03-10SenateSet for hearing April 1.
2020-02-27SenateReferred to Com. on EQ.
2020-02-20SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
2020-02-19SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code42451.1New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback