CA SB1098 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 154, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 7840, 7847, 7850, 7850.1, 7850.5, 7850.6, and 7887 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Geologists and geophysicists: fees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-07-05 - Assembly - SB 1098 Cannella Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1098 Cannella (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1098 Cannella Reconsider (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1098 Cannella (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-20 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 154, Statutes of 2018.
2018-07-20 Approved by the Governor.
2018-07-11SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-07-05SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-07-05AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 6108.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-06-28AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 27).
2018-06-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-05-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4337.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-29SenateReconsideration granted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4336.)
2018-05-29SenateMotion to reconsider made by Senator Cannella.
2018-05-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-23SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-22SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2018-04-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4783.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-12SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-03-20SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2018-02-22SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-02-14SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
2018-02-13SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback