CA SB1098 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 154, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 154, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 7840, 7847, 7850, 7850.1, 7850.5, 7850.6, and 7887 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Geologists and geophysicists: fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-07-05 - Assembly - SB 1098 Cannella Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1098 Cannella (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1098 Cannella Reconsider (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1098 Cannella (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1098 Cannella (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1098 Cannella Reconsider (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1098 Cannella (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-20 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 154, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-07-20 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-07-11 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-07-05 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-07-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 6108.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-06-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 27). |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4337.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4336.) |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Motion to reconsider made by Senator Cannella. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-22 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 22. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4783.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 7840 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7847 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7850 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7850.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7850.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7850.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 7887 | Amended Code | Citation Text |