CA SB1097 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-18 - March 30 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-18 - March 30 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 654.3 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Medical services: credit or loan.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | March 30 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Set for hearing March 30. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | March 23 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Set for hearing March 23. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 654.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1097 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1097 |