CA SB1091 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 69 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property taxation: transfer of base year value: disaster relief.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25SenateMay 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2018-05-23SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-22SenateMay 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2018-05-09SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4995.) (May 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-02SenateSet for hearing May 9.
2018-02-22SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2018-02-13SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
2018-02-12SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Revenue and Taxation Code69Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback