CA SB1091 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 589, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 589, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 10231.3 and 10235.9a to the Insurance Code, relating to insurance.
Title
Long-term care insurance.
Sponsors
Sen. Carol Liu [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-26 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1091 Liu Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-24 - Assembly - SB 1091 Liu Senate Third Reading By BROWN (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1091 Liu (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-24 - Assembly - SB 1091 Liu Senate Third Reading By BROWN (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1091 Liu (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 589, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-24 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-01 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2016-08-26 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5448.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-25 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6227.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 22). |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2016-05-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3873.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-09 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3560.) (April 13). |
2016-04-04 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 13. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Insurance Code | 10231.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10231.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10233.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10235.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |