CA SB1090 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 561, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 712.7 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Diablo Canyon nuclear powerplant.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-20 - Assembly - SB 1090 Monning Senate Third Reading By CUNNINGHAM (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1090 Monning et al (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-19 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 561, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-19 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-28SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2018-08-21SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 67. Noes 1. Page 6411.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-09AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (August 8).
2018-06-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-14AssemblyReferred to Com. on U. & E.
2018-05-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 4. Page 4348.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4303.) (May 25).
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-07SenateMay 7 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-27SenateSet for hearing May 7.
2018-04-26SenateApril 30 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-04-20SenateSet for hearing April 30.
2018-04-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 4719.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 4718.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2018-04-06SenateSet for hearing April 18 in EQ. pending receipt.
2018-04-06SenateSet for hearing April 17.
2018-04-04SenateRe-referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and EQ.
2018-03-15SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-22SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-13SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
2018-02-12SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities Code712.7New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code713New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback