CA SB1090 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 120500, 120505, 120510, 120515, 120535, 120540, 120565, 120575, and 120605 of, to add Section 120511 to, and to repeal and add Section 120525 of, the Health and Safety Code, relating to sexually transmitted diseases.
Title
Sexually transmitted diseases: outreach and screening services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-26 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1090 Mitchell Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1090 Mitchell Senate Third Reading By BURKE (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1090 Mitchell (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1090 Mitchell Senate Third Reading By BURKE (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1090 Mitchell (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5. | |
2016-09-26 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2016-09-26 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2016-09-01 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2016-08-26 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5450.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-23 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6102.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2016-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-08-01 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4144.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4003.) (May 27). |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | April 25 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3445.) (April 6). |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 120500 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 120505 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 120510 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 120511 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 120515 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 120535 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 120540 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 120565 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 120575 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 120605 | Amended Code | Citation Text |