CA SB109 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 363, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend the Budget Act of 2019 (Chapters 23 and 55 of the Statutes of 2019) by amending Items 0250-101-0001, 0515-101-0001, 0540-001-6088, 0540-101-0001, 0540-101-3228, 0555-001-0001, 0690-101-0001, 0820-001-0001, 0840-001-0970, 0954-101-0001, 1111-002-0702, 2240-103-0001, 2240-105-0001, 3340-001-0001, 3340-001-0318, 3340-001-3228, 3540-001-0001, 3540-002-3228, 3540-490, 3600-490, 3600-495, 3760-001-6088, 3760-101-0565, 3760-101-6088, 3790-101-0001, 3790-101-6088, 3790-492, 3790-493, 3790-496, 3860-101-0001, 3860-301-6083, 3860-490, 3860-495, 3900-490, 3940-101-0001, 3960-001-0001, 3970-001-0133, 4140-101-0001, 4170-101-0001, 4260-001-3305, 4300-001-0001, 4440-011-0001, 4560-001-3085, 4560-101-3085, 5180-101-0001, 5180-151-0001, 5180-153-0001, 5180-492, 5225-491, 5227-108-0001, 6100-001-0001, 6100-001-0890, 6100-125-0890, 6100-136-0890, 6100-149-0001, 6100-182-0001, 6100-194-0001, 6100-194-0890, 6100-195-0890, 6100-485, 6100-488, 6120-161-0001, 6120-217-0001, 6440-001-0001, 6610-001-0001, 6870-101-0001, 6870-488, 6980-101-0001, 7120-001-3228, 7120-101-3228, 7120-491, 7730-001-0001, 7760-301-0666, and 9210-102-0001 of, and adding Items 0540-301-6088, 0690-105-0001, 0690-493, 0720-490, 3540-101-0001, 3600-301-8018, 3600-311-6051, 3640-301-6031, 3640-495, 3860-301-0001, 6870-101-3273, and 6870-302-6087 to, Section 2.00 of, and amending Sections 12.32, 35.50, and 39.00 of, that act, relating to the state budget, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, budget bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Budget Act of 2019.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-13 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB109 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-12 - Assembly - SB 109 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 63 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB109 B. & F.R (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-27 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 363, Statutes of 2019.
2019-09-27 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-20SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
2019-09-13SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 2930.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-09-12SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-09-12AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 63. Noes 12. Page 3463.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-09-12AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended.
2019-09-12AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2019-09-12AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2019-09-12AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended.
2019-09-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-05-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-04-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-04-11SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 674.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-04-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-08SenateOrdered to second reading.
2019-04-08SenateWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 582.)
2019-01-24SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2019-01-11SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback