CA SB109 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 363, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 363, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend the Budget Act of 2019 (Chapters 23 and 55 of the Statutes of 2019) by amending Items 0250-101-0001, 0515-101-0001, 0540-001-6088, 0540-101-0001, 0540-101-3228, 0555-001-0001, 0690-101-0001, 0820-001-0001, 0840-001-0970, 0954-101-0001, 1111-002-0702, 2240-103-0001, 2240-105-0001, 3340-001-0001, 3340-001-0318, 3340-001-3228, 3540-001-0001, 3540-002-3228, 3540-490, 3600-490, 3600-495, 3760-001-6088, 3760-101-0565, 3760-101-6088, 3790-101-0001, 3790-101-6088, 3790-492, 3790-493, 3790-496, 3860-101-0001, 3860-301-6083, 3860-490, 3860-495, 3900-490, 3940-101-0001, 3960-001-0001, 3970-001-0133, 4140-101-0001, 4170-101-0001, 4260-001-3305, 4300-001-0001, 4440-011-0001, 4560-001-3085, 4560-101-3085, 5180-101-0001, 5180-151-0001, 5180-153-0001, 5180-492, 5225-491, 5227-108-0001, 6100-001-0001, 6100-001-0890, 6100-125-0890, 6100-136-0890, 6100-149-0001, 6100-182-0001, 6100-194-0001, 6100-194-0890, 6100-195-0890, 6100-485, 6100-488, 6120-161-0001, 6120-217-0001, 6440-001-0001, 6610-001-0001, 6870-101-0001, 6870-488, 6980-101-0001, 7120-001-3228, 7120-101-3228, 7120-491, 7730-001-0001, 7760-301-0666, and 9210-102-0001 of, and adding Items 0540-301-6088, 0690-105-0001, 0690-493, 0720-490, 3540-101-0001, 3600-301-8018, 3600-311-6051, 3640-301-6031, 3640-495, 3860-301-0001, 6870-101-3273, and 6870-302-6087 to, Section 2.00 of, and amending Sections 12.32, 35.50, and 39.00 of, that act, relating to the state budget, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, budget bill.
Title
Budget Act of 2019.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-13 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB109 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-12 - Assembly - SB 109 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 63 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB109 B. & F.R (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-12 - Assembly - SB 109 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 63 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB109 B. & F.R (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 363, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-20 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2019-09-13 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 2930.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-12 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 63. Noes 12. Page 3463.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 674.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 582.) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |