CA SB1088 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-07-05 - Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 8587.13 to the Government Code, and to amend Section 454 of, and to add Chapter 11 (commencing with Section 2899) to Part 2 of Division 1 of, the Public Utilities Code, relating to public utilities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Safety, reliability, and resiliency planning: general rate case cycle.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1088 Dodd (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-05AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2018-07-03AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-07-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (June 28).
2018-06-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2018-06-12AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
2018-06-07AssemblyReferred to Coms. on U. & E. and G.O.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 2. Page 4407.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25Senate(Corrected May 26).
2018-05-25SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 4303.) (May 25).
2018-05-23SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-22SenateMay 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-15SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2018-05-14SenateMay 14 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 14.
2018-05-02SenateMay 7 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-05-02SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-27SenateSet for hearing May 7.
2018-04-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1. Page 4785.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-19SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2018-04-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 4718.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2018-04-09SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2018-04-06SenateSet for hearing April 17.
2018-04-04SenateRe-referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and G.O.
2018-03-15SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-22SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-13SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
2018-02-12SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code8587.13New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code2899New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code454Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code768.7New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback