CA SB1088 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 803 of the Penal Code, relating to wrongful concealment.
Title
Wrongful concealment: statute of limitations.
Sponsors
Sen. Janet Nguyen [R] | Sen. Patricia Bates [R] | Sen. Jean Fuller [R] | Sen. Cathleen Galgiani [D] |
Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] | Asm. William Brough [R] | Asm. Donald Wagner [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-25 - Senate - Special Consent SB1088 Nguyen (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-18 - Assembly - SB 1088 Nguyen Senate Third Reading By KIM (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - MOTIONDCX153** (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1088 Nguyen (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-18 - Assembly - SB 1088 Nguyen Senate Third Reading By KIM (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - MOTIONDCX153** (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1088 Nguyen (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5. | |
2016-09-30 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2016-09-30 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2016-08-31 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2016-08-25 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5430.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-23 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2016-08-19 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 5885.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-04 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-01 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-28 | Assembly | June 28 set for first hearing. Reconsideration of favorable vote granted. |
2016-06-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4043.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4003.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-05-02 | Senate | May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing May 2. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3613.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 152 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 803 | Amended Code | Citation Text |