CA SB1087 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-20 - Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 22105, 22680, 22681, 22682, 22684, 22685, 22687, 22688, 22689, 22690, 22693, 22694, and 22716 of, and to add Section 22690.5 to, the Financial Code, and to amend Section 5940 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to the Property Assessed Clean Energy program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PACE program: program administrators.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Banking and Finance] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1087 Roth (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-20AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2018-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
2018-06-12AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2018-06-07AssemblyReferred to Coms. on L. GOV. and B. & F.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4380.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4303.) (May 25).
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-04-30SenateApril 30 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-20SenateSet for hearing April 30.
2018-04-19SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4745.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-21SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2018-03-15SenateRe-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
2018-03-15SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-03-15SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-02-22SenateReferred to Com. on I., B. & F.I.
2018-02-13SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
2018-02-12SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Financial Code22105Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code22680Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code22681Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code22682Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code22684Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code22685Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code22686Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code22687Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code22688Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code22688.Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code22689Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code22690Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code22690.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Financial Code22693Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code22694Amended CodeCitation Text
Financial Code22716Amended CodeCitation Text
Streets and Highways Code5940Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback