CA SB1087 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 798, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 798, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 22105, 22680, 22681, 22682, 22684, 22685, 22687, 22688, 22689, 22690, 22693, 22694, and 22716 of, and to add Section 22690.5 to, the Financial Code, and to amend Section 5940 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to the Property Assessed Clean Energy program.
Title
PACE program: program administrators.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1087 Roth Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - SB 1087 Roth Senate Third Reading By AGUIAR-CURRY (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Banking and Finance] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1087 Roth (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - SB 1087 Roth Senate Third Reading By AGUIAR-CURRY (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Banking and Finance] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1087 Roth (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 798, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-10 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6059.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-30 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2018-08-29 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6797.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2018-08-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and B. & F. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4380.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4303.) (May 25). |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | April 30 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4745.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on I., B. & F.I. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Financial Code | 22105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22680 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22681 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22682 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22684 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22685 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22686 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22687 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22688 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22688. | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22689 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22690 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22690.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Financial Code | 22693 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22694 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 22716 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Streets and Highways Code | 5940 | Amended Code | Citation Text |