CA SB1086 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - April 20 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Environmental Quality Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - April 20 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Environmental Quality Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 38590.1 of, and to add Section 39719.3 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to air resources.
Title
Greenhouse Gas Reduction Fund: Salton Sea restoration.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Senate | April 20 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on E.Q., N.R. & W., and APPR. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 38590.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 39719.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |