CA SB1084 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-16 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 111, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 401, 402, 403, 404, and 802 of the Mono County Tri-Valley Groundwater Management District Act (Chapter 844 of the Statutes of 1989), relating to groundwater management district.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mono County Tri-Valley Groundwater Management District.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-28 - Assembly - SB 1084 Berryhill, T. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1084 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-09 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-16 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 111, Statutes of 2018.
2018-07-16 Approved by the Governor.
2018-07-05SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2018-06-28SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-06-28AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6033.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-06-25AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-06-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 20).
2018-05-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. GOV.
2018-05-17AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-17SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5089.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-10SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-05-09SenateFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4995.) (May 9).
2018-05-02SenateSet for hearing May 9.
2018-04-04SenateRe-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2018-03-22SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-22SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-13SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
2018-02-12SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code23232Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback