CA SB1083 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 935, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 935, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1517 and 1517.1 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 11402, 11461.6, 16501.01, 16507.5, 16519.5, and 18360 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to child welfare.
Title
Resource family approval.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1083 Mitchell et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - SB 1083 Mitchell Senate Third Reading By STONE (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1083 Mitchell et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - SB 1083 Mitchell Senate Third Reading By STONE (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1083 Mitchell et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 935, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-10 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 6059.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-30 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2018-08-29 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6797.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-07-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4380.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4303.) (May 25). |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | April 30 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | April 23 hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4624.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1517 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1517.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11363 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11402 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11461.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 16501.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 16507.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 16519.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 18360 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 358.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 360 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 361.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 366.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |