CA SB1080 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-05 - Referred to Com. on ED.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-05 - Referred to Com. on ED.
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 6 (commencing with Section 52770) to Chapter 11 of Part 28 of Division 4 of Title 2 of the Education Code, relating to pupils.
Title
College and career fairs.
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Min [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1080 Min (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-03-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3281.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3203.) (March 23). |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Set for hearing March 23. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 52770 | New Code | See Bill Text |