CA SB1080 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 511, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 5445.3 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation network companies: driver requirements and identification.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-20 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1080 Roth Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - SB 1080 Roth Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1080 Newman (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Energy, Utilities and Communications] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-18 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 511, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-18 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-24SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-20SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5425.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-16SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-16AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6311.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-09AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-08-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
2018-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-20AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2018-06-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
2018-06-07AssemblyReferred to Coms. on C. & C. and TRANS.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4419.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateOrdered to second reading.
2018-05-25SenateRead third time and amended.
2018-05-23SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-22SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-05-15SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 22.
2018-05-10SenateMay 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 14.
2018-05-02SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-01SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 4850.) (April 25).
2018-04-17SenateSet for hearing April 25.
2018-04-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E., U. & C. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 4606.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2018-03-29SenateSet for hearing April 10.
2018-02-22SenateReferred to Coms. on T. & H. and E., U. & C.
2018-02-13SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
2018-02-12SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities Code5445.3New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback