CA SB108 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 28 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-08-22 - From committee: That the bill be retained in committee, and that the subject matter be referred to the Committee on Rules for assignment to the proper committee for study. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 15.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act relating to firearms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firearms.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-08-15 - Assembly - Subject matter be referred (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB108 Yee (Y: 21 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-16 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-08-22AssemblyFrom committee: That the bill be retained in committee, and that the subject matter be referred to the Committee on Rules for assignment to the proper committee for study. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 15.)
2013-08-15AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 2550.)
2013-08-14AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2013-08-13AssemblyHearing postponed by committee.
2013-07-02AssemblySet, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
2013-06-27AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2013-06-17AssemblyReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2013-05-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2013-05-28SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 17. Page 1114.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2013-04-30SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2013-04-29SenateFrom committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2013-04-19SenateSet for hearing April 29.
2013-04-17SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 567.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2013-04-01SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2013-03-13SenateSet for hearing April 16.
2013-03-11SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
2013-01-24SenateReferred to Com. on PUB. S.
2013-01-15SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 14.
2013-01-14SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Penal Code16520Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code16540Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code16750Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code16850Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code17060New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code23510Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code27505Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code27880Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code27881New CodeSee Bill Text
Penal Code27945Amended CodeCitation Text
Penal Code31810Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sb_108&sess=1314&house=S
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_108_bill_20130114_introduced.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_108_bill_20130311_amended_sen_v98.htm
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_108_bill_20130311_amended_sen_v98.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_108_bill_20130401_amended_sen_v97.htm
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_108_bill_20130401_amended_sen_v97.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_108_bill_20130627_amended_asm_v96.html
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_108_bill_20130114_introduced.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_108_bill_20130311_amended_sen_v98.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_108_bill_20130401_amended_sen_v97.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_108_bill_20130627_amended_asm_v96.pdf
Texthttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_108_bill_20130814_amended_asm_v95.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_108_vote_20130416_000003_sen_comm.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_108_vote_20130528_0543PM_sen_floor.html
Roll Callhttp://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/13-14/bill/sen/sb_0101-0150/sb_108_vote_20130815_000003_asm_comm.html

Bill Comments

feedback