CA SB1079 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 4799.05 of, and to add Section 705.5 to, the Public Resources Code, relating to forest resources, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Forest resources: fire prevention grants: advance payments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-14AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-13AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 11).
2018-05-17AssemblyReferred to Com. on NAT. RES.
2018-05-10AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-10SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5014.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-08SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-05-07SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2018-04-27SenateSet for hearing May 7.
2018-04-25SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-24SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4787.) (April 24).
2018-04-10SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2018-04-04SenateRe-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2018-03-15SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-22SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-13SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
2018-02-12SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Resources Code4584Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code4799.05Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code705.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback