CA SB1077 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-28 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 2782.95 and 2782.96 of, and to add Section 2782.97 to, the Civil Code, relating to construction contracts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Construction contracts: wrap-up insurance and indemnification.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1077 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-28AssemblyOrdered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
2018-08-24AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-24AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2018-08-21AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 16).
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-06-27AssemblyJune 27 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-06-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-13AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-05-25AssemblyReferred to Com. on JUD.
2018-05-17AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-17SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5089.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-15SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-05-14SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2018-05-07SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 14.
2018-05-01SenateMay 7 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-04-27SenateSet for hearing May 7.
2018-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4814.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-16SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2018-04-05SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2018-04-04SenateApril 17 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-03-29SenateSet for hearing April 17.
2018-02-22SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2018-02-13SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
2018-02-12SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Civil Code2782.9New CodeSee Bill Text
Civil Code2782.95Repealed CodeCitation Text
Civil Code2782.96Repealed CodeCitation Text
Civil Code2782.97New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback