CA SB1077 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-28 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-28 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2782.95 and 2782.96 of, and to add Section 2782.97 to, the Civil Code, relating to construction contracts.
Title
Construction contracts: wrap-up insurance and indemnification.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Wilk [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1077 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1077 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-28 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2018-08-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 16). |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-27 | Assembly | June 27 hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5089.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 14. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | May 7 hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Set for hearing May 7. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4814.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | April 17 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 2782.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 2782.95 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 2782.96 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 2782.97 | New Code | See Bill Text |