CA SB1076 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-18 - March 31 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-18 - March 31 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4904 of, to add Sections 1203.95, 4907, and 4908 to, and to add Chapter 16 (commencing with Section 1425) to Title 10 of Part 2 of, the Penal Code, relating to criminal procedure.
Title
Factual innocence: compensation and services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | March 31 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Set for hearing March 31. |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21. |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1203.95 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 4904 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 4907 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 4908 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1076 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB1076 |