CA SB1076 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 353, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 8570.6 to the Government Code, relating to emergency preparedness.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency preparedness: electrical utilities: electromagnetic pulse attacks and geomagnetic storm events.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-24 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1076 Hertzberg et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1076 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By RIVAS (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1076 Hertzberg et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-11 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 353, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-11 Approved by the Governor.
2018-08-30SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
2018-08-24SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5690.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-23SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-23AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6481.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-16AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2018-08-14AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-13AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-09AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
2018-07-05AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-07-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 28).
2018-06-21AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2018-06-14AssemblyReferred to Com. on G.O.
2018-05-29AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4333.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-21SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-17SenateOrdered to second reading.
2018-05-17SenateRead third time and amended.
2018-05-15SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-14SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 14.
2018-04-30SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 4785.) (April 24).
2018-04-17SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2018-04-04SenateRe-referred to Com. on G.O.
2018-03-19SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-22SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-02-13SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
2018-02-12SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code8570.6New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code8586.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Vehicle Code32000Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback