CA SB1074 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Set for hearing April 23.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 13651 of, and to add Section 13654 to, the Business and Professions Code, and to add Chapter 4.7 (commencing with Section 25370) to Division 15 of the Public Resources Code, relating to vehicular fuel.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicle fuel: disclosure of government-imposed costs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-23 - Senate - [04-23-2018] hearing: Motion to Reconsider. [Reconsideration Granted.] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2018-04-12SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2018-02-13SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15.
2018-02-12SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code13651Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code13654New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code25370New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback