CA SB1072 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 323, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 20 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 323, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 4.6.5 (commencing with Section 53758.5) to Chapter 4 of Part 1 of Division 2 of Title 5 of the Government Code, relating to local government.
Title
Local government: Proposition 218: remedies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1072 Padilla Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-28 - Assembly - SB 1072 Padilla Senate Third Reading By Pacheco (Y: 59 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1072 Padilla (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-08-28 - Assembly - SB 1072 Padilla Senate Third Reading By Pacheco (Y: 59 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1072 Padilla (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-20 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 323, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-09-20 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2024-08-29 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 5647.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2024-08-28 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2024-08-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 13. Page 6687.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2024-06-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2024-06-17 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2024-05-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 5. Page 4141.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3820.) (May 1). |
2024-04-24 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 53758.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |