CA SB1070 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 65302 and 65361 of the Government Code, relating to land use.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Land use: general plans.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-25SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2020-02-27SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2020-02-19SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
2020-02-18SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code65302Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code65361Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback