CA SB107 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 53, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend the Budget Act of 2016 (Chapter 23 of the Statutes of 2016) by amending Items 2660-110-0042, 6100-161-0001, and 6870-101-0001 of Section 2.00 of that act, relating to the state budget, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, budget bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Budget Act of 2016.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-26 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB107 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Assembly - SB 107 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 71 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB107 B. & F.R (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-10 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 53, Statutes of 2017.
2017-07-10 Approved by the Governor.
2017-06-29SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
2017-06-26SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 1706.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2017-06-22SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2017-06-22AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 1. Page 2305.) Ordered to the Senate.
2017-06-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-06-19AssemblyOrdered to second reading.
2017-06-19AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2017-06-19AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 46. Noes 19. Page 2250.)
2017-06-14AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2017-06-05AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2017-05-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-11SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 1037.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2017-05-08SenateOrdered to second reading.
2017-05-08SenateWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 982.)
2017-01-19SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2017-01-12SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 11.
2017-01-11SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback