CA SB107 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add and repeal Section 6363.4 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales and use taxes: exemption: nonprofit organization:

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-06-29 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-02-01 Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
2009-08-27 Held in committee and under submission.
2009-08-25 Set for hearing August 27. (Suspense - vote only.)
2009-06-29 Placed on APPR suspense file.
2009-06-19 Set for hearing June 29.
2009-06-16 Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2009-06-15 From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1283.)
2009-06-04 Set for hearing June 10. (Suspense - for vote only.)
2009-05-13 Placed on REV. & TAX. suspense file.
2009-04-14 Set for hearing May 13.
2009-02-05 To Com. on REV. & TAX.
2009-01-28 From print. May be acted upon on or after February 27.
2009-01-27 Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback