CA SB1065 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
Pending: Assembly Human Services Committee
Hearing: Jul 20 @ 2:00 pm in State Capitol, Room 4202
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 11450 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CalWORKs: homeless assistance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1065 Hertzberg et al (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29AssemblyReferred to Com. on HUM. S.
2020-06-25AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2020-06-25SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2020-06-25SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2020-06-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-18SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2020-06-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 18).
2020-06-11SenateSet for hearing June 18.
2020-06-09SenateJune 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2020-06-03SenateSet for hearing June 9.
2020-05-21SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-05-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3560.) (May 19).
2020-05-08SenateSet for hearing May 19.
2020-03-23SenateMarch 23 hearing postponed by committee.
2020-03-20SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2020-03-04SenateSet for hearing March 23.
2020-02-27SenateReferred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2020-02-19SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20.
2020-02-18SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code11450Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback