CA SB1065 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 628, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 628, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1294.4 to the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to arbitration.
Title
Dismissal or denial of petitions to compel arbitration: appeals: Elder and Dependent Adult Civil Protection Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-26 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1065 Monning Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-24 - Assembly - SB 1065 Monning Senate Third Reading By CHIU (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-10 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1065 Monning (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-24 - Assembly - SB 1065 Monning Senate Third Reading By CHIU (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-08-10 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1065 Monning (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 628, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-01 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2016-08-26 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5447.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-25 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6242.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-18 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Waldron. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-08-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (August 10). |
2016-08-01 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-08-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. |
2016-08-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2016-06-21 | Assembly | June 21 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-05-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 9. Page 3738.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3700.) (April 26). |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 1286.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 1294 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 1294.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 36 | Amended Code | Citation Text |