CA SB1061 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 831, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 831, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 5091 of the Education Code, relating to elections.
Title
School district and community college district elections: special elections: petition requirements: election timing.
Sponsors
Sen. John Laird [D] | Sen. Dave Cortese [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-16 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1061 Laird et al. Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - SB 1061 Laird Senate Third Reading By Bryan (Y: 59 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1061 Laird et al (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - SB 1061 Laird Senate Third Reading By Bryan (Y: 59 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1061 Laird et al (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 831, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-23 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m. | |
2022-08-16 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 4847.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-11 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 18. Page 5821.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (August 3). |
2022-06-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 15). |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ELECTIONS. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 9. Page 3880.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3540.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | April 25 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 5091 | Amended Code | Citation Text |