CA SB106 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 55, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend the Budget Act of 2019 by amending Items 0530-001-0001, 4800-101-0001, 6440-001-0001, and 6610-001-0001 of, and adding Item 0530-495 to, Section 2.00 of, and amending Section 39.00 of, that act, relating to the state budget, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, budget bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Budget Act of 2019.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-24 - Assembly - SB 106 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB106 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 30 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB106 B. & F.R (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 55, Statutes of 2019.
2019-07-01 Approved by the Governor.
2019-06-27SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2019-06-24SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 1726.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-06-24SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-06-24AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 2399.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-06-24AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 and 96 suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 8. Page 2390.)
2019-06-24AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2019-06-24AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2019-06-20AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-06-17AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-05-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-04-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-04-11SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 673.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-04-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-08SenateOrdered to second reading.
2019-04-08SenateWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 582.)
2019-01-24SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2019-01-11SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback