CA SB1056 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 881, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 881, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Title 1.81.46 (commencing with Section 1798.99.20) to Part 4 of Division 3 of the Civil Code, relating to social media.
Title
Violent posts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1056 Umberg et al. Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1056 Umberg Senate Third Reading By Gabriel (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1056 Umberg (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-23 - Assembly - SB 1056 Umberg Senate Third Reading By Gabriel (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1056 Umberg (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 881, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-06 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5305.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-24 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 21). |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and JUD. |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3905.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3781.) (May 19). |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | May 9 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3436.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR. |
2022-03-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1798.99.20 | New Code | See Bill Text |