CA SB1056 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-16 - August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-16 - August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 532 of, and to add Section 214.18 to, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Property taxes: welfare exemption: community land trust.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Asm. Steven Choi [R] | Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D] | Sen. Mike McGuire [D] |
Sen. Josh Newman [D] | Sen. Anthony Portantino [D] | Sen. Bob Wieckowski [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1056 Beall et al (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1056 Beall et al (Y: 36 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-16 | Assembly | August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2018-08-15 | Assembly | August 15 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-08-07 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-08-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 2). |
2018-06-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 2. Page 4348.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4303.) (May 25). |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2018-05-22 | Senate | May 22 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 22. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4914.) (May 2). |
2018-04-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing May 2. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 214.18 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 532 | Amended Code | Citation Text |