CA SB1056 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-24 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
Pending: Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-24 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
Pending: Senate Revenue and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 17053.81 and 23623.3 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Income taxes: hiring credit: veterans.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Davis [D] | Asm. Chuck de Vore [R] | Sen. Jeff Denham [R] | Asm. Nathan Fletcher [R] |
Asm. Danny Gilmore [R] | Asm. Kevin Jeffries [R] | Sen. Abel Maldonado [R] | Sen. Patricia Wiggins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-24 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |
2010-04-29 | Placed on REV. & TAX. suspense file. | |
2010-04-21 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |
2010-04-20 | Set for hearing April 28. | |
2010-02-25 | To Com. on REV. & TAX. | |
2010-02-17 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 19. | |
2010-02-16 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |