CA SB1054 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 980, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 980, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1320.10 and 1320.26 of the Penal Code, relating to pretrial release and detention.
Title
Pretrial release and detention: pretrial services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1054 Hertzberg et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1054 Hertzberg et al. Concurrence Reconsider (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1054 Hertzberg et al. Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Assembly - SB 1054 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By BONTA (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1054 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1054 Hertzberg et al. Concurrence Reconsider (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1054 Hertzberg et al. Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-28 - Assembly - SB 1054 Hertzberg Senate Third Reading By BONTA (Y: 75 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1054 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 980, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-06 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-29 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 5957.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-29 | Senate | Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5961.) |
2018-08-29 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 5957.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-28 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 6721.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | Action rescinded whereby the bill was re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2018-08-21 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-21 | Assembly | From inactive file. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Calderon. |
2018-08-13 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file. |
2018-08-13 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2018-08-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8). |
2018-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | June 12 hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4942.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4719.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | April 4 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on EQ. |
2018-02-13 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 15. |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 25359.21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 1320.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1320.26 | Amended Code | Citation Text |